District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0444 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/19/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________ 
 
 
To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 
voluntary agreements.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 
be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 215a(a) of Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. 
Law 23-246; D.C. Official Code§ 42-3502.15a(a)), is amended striking the phrase “2 years 
beginning on October 1, 2021” and inserting the phrase “one year beginning on October 1, 2023. 
 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia