District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0448 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/18/2023

                    1 
                     _______________________________ 1 
  Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
  4 
  5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
 8 
__________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
____________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Advisory Neighborhood 17 
Commissions Act of 1975 to continue authorization for Advisory Neighborhood 18 
Commissions to meet remotely. 19 
 20 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUN	CIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 
Act may be cited as the “	Advisory Neighborhood Commissions Remote Operations 22 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 23 
Sec. 2. Section 14(b) of t	he Advisory Neighborhood Commissions Act of 1975, effective 24 
March 26, 1976 (D.C. Law 1-	58; D.C. Official Code § 1 -309.11(b)) is amended as follows: 25 
(a) Paragraph (1A) is repealed. 26 
(b) A new paragraph (1C) is added to read as follows: 27 
 “(1C) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, an Advisory Neighborhood 28 
Commissioner may call a meeting and remotely participate in that meeting and vote on matters 29 
before the Commission without being physically present through a teleconference or through 30 
digital means identified by the Commission for this purpose. Members physically or remotely 31 
present shall be counted for determination of a quorum.”. 32 
Sec. 3. Applicability 33  2 
This act shall apply as of July 26, 2023. 
34 
Sec. 4. Fiscal i mpact s tatement. 35 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 36 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 37 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 38 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 39 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 40 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 41 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 42 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 43 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)).  44