District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0502 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/26/2023

                    GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Office 
of the Attorney General 
*** 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
September 26, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson, Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John 
A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, 
DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council 
of the District of Columbia is proposed 
emergency legislation, the "Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll 
PLLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 
of 2024" and accompanying 
emergency declaration resolution 
to approve the award of the proposed definitive multiyear 
Contract Number DCCB-2023-F-0039 to Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC (Cohen Milstein). 
This contract arranges outside legal counsel from Cohen Milstein 
to assist the Office of the 
Attorney General with the investigation 
of and potential litigation against identified targets in the 
housing industry for violations 
of antitrust laws. The contract 	is a definitive multi-year, 
contingency-fee contract with a not-to-exceed contract amount 
of $90 million. The base period 
of performance is from the date of award through five years thereafter. This contract will 
definitize a letter contract awarded on May 26, 2023. 
If you have any questions, please contact Deputy Attorney General Candyce Phoenix at (202) 
788-2066 or Candyce.Phoenix@dc.gov. I look forward 
to favorable consideration of this 
contract. 
Sincerely, 
Brian 
L. Schwalb 
Attorney General 
Enclosures 
400 Sixth Street NW, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20001-5790, (202) 727-3400, Fax (202) 730-0484  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
~ 
at the request of the Attorney General 
A BILL 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
16 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen 
17 Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, 
to provide legal services to the Office 	of the Attorney 
18 General, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received 
19 under the contract. 
20 
21 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
22 act may be cited as the "Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll 
23 PLLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 	of 2023". 
24 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
25 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51 ), and section 202 	of the 
26 Procurement Practices Reform Act 
of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
27 Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 
28 with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, 	to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney 
29 General for an anti-trust matter, and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount 
of $90 
30 million for goods and services received and to 
be received under Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-
31 0039. 
32 Sec. 3. The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement provided by the Chief Financial 
33 Officer as the fiscal impact statement required by section 4a 	of the General Legislative  34 Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code§ 	1-
35 301.47a). 
36 Sec. 4. This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or 	in the event of 
37 veto by the Mayor, action by the Council 	to override the veto), and shall remain 	in effect for no 
38 longer than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts 	of the Council of the District of Columbia in 
39 Section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 	1973 (87 
40 Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code§ l-204.12(a)).