District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0512 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/02/2023

                     	1 
 ______________________________1 
             Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_______ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
 11 
______________________ 12 
 13 
 14 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979  15 
to provide that the payment or award of compensation under the workers’ compensation 16 
law of any other state shall not bar a claim for compensation under the District’s workers’ 17 
compensation law for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award under the 18 
District’s workers’ compensation law shall be reduced by the amount of compensation 19 
received or awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state. 20 
 21 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 
act may be cited as the “Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Temporary Amendment Act 23 
of 2023”. 24 
 Sec. 2. Section 4(a-1) of the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979, 25 
effective July 1, 1980 (D.C. Law 3-77; D.C. Official Code § 32-1503(a-1)), is amended to read 26 
as follows:  27 
“(a-1)(1) Notwithstanding any other law, the payment or award of compensation under 28 
the workers’ compensation law of any other state to an employee or his dependent shall not bar a 29 
claim for compensation under this act for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award 30 
of compensation under this act shall be reduced by the amount of compensation received or 31 
awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state. 32 
“(2) This subsection shall apply to all claims under this act that are pending as of 33   	2 
the effective date of the Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Emergency Amendment Act 34 
of 2022, as introduced on June 6, 2022 (Bill 24-841), and all claims under this act filed after the 35 
effective date of the Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Emergency Amendment Act of 36 
2022, as introduced on June 6, 2022 (Bill 24-841).”. 37 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 38 
This act shall apply as of May 4, 2023. 39 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 40 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 41 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 42 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 43 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 44 
 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 45 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 46 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 47 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 48 
Columbia Register. 49 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect 50