District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0512 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/07/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
____________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979  
to provide that the payment or award of compensation under the workers’ compensation 
law of any other state shall not bar a claim for compensation under the District’s workers’ 
compensation law for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award under the 
District’s workers’ compensation law shall be reduced by the amount of compensation 
received or awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Temporary Amendment Act 
of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 4(a-1) of the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979, 
effective July 1, 1980 (D.C. Law 3-77; D.C. Official Code § 32-1503(a-1)), is amended to read 
as follows:  
“(a-1)(1) Notwithstanding any other law, the payment or award of compensation under 
the workers’ compensation law of any other state to an employee or his dependent shall not bar a 
claim for compensation under this act for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award 
of compensation under this act shall be reduced by the amount of compensation received or 
awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state. 
“(2) This subsection shall apply to all claims under this act that are pending as of 
June 28, 2022, and all claims under this act filed after June 28, 2022.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of May 4, 2023. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 
Columbia Register. 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia