District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0528 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/02/2023

                     	1 
 	_________________________ 1 
 	Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2 
 3 
 4 
A BILL 5 
 6 
_________________ 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
 10 
______________ 11 
 12 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 13 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2011 to clarify the requirement that the CJCC report 14 
aggregate programmatic data on process and outcomes of programs. 15 
 16 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this 17 
act may be cited as the “CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Temporary Amendment 18 
Act of 2023”. 19 
Sec. 2. Section 1501 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 20 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2011, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 21 
Code § 22-4234), is amended by adding new subsections (b-5) and (b-6) to read as follows: 22 
“(b-5)(1) By December 1, 2023, and on a quarterly basis thereafter, the CJCC shall 23 
submit to the Mayor and the Council and post on its website a report that includes the following 24 
information, in accordance with existing law: Aggregate data on the following with respect to the 25 
criminal justice and juvenile justice systems: diversion, pretrial supervision, detention, 26 
prosecution, sentencing, commitment, incarceration, probation, parole, supervised release, 27 
deferred prosecution agreements, deferred sentencing agreements, deferred disposition 28 
agreements, and consent decrees. 29 
 “(2) The CJCC shall include in the report information and context to aid the 30 
general public in interpretation of the data. 31   	2 
“(3) Prior to submitting and posting aggregate data, the CJCC shall provide each 32 
agency that supplies data at least one week to review and comment on the data presentation and 33 
any analysis relevant to the agency. The CJCC shall review the feedback provided by agencies 34 
and determine, in its sole discretion, whether to revise the presentation and analysis accordingly. 35 
“(b-6) The CJCC shall post the following year-to-date data on its website monthly, 36 
beginning with the earliest year for which CJCC is able to obtain historical data:  37 
 “(1) Arrests for violent crimes committed by juveniles and adults, by offense; and 38 
 “(2) Gun violence and homicide counts and rates citywide and by ward, 39 
neighborhood, and police service area.”.    40 
Sec. 3. Section 5 of the Prioritizing Public Safety Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, 41 
passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-396), is repealed.  42 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 43 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 44 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 45 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 46 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  47 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 48 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 60-day period of Congressional review 49 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 50 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 51 
Columbia Register. 52 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 53