District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0528 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 10/03/2023

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A BILL 1 
 2 
25-528  3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
_____________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 10 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2011 to clarify the requirement that the CJCC report 11 
aggregate programmatic data on process and outcomes of programs. 12 
 13 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this 14 
act may be cited as the “CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Temporary Amendment 15 
Act of 2023”. 16 
Sec. 2. Section 1501 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 17 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2011, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 18 
Code § 22-4234), is amended by adding new subsections (b-5) and (b-6) to read as follows: 19 
“(b-5)(1) By December 1, 2023, and on a quarterly basis thereafter, the CJCC shall 20 
submit to the Mayor and the Council and post on its website a report that includes the following 21 
information, in accordance with existing law: Aggregate data on the following with respect to the 22 
criminal justice and juvenile justice systems: diversion, pretrial supervision, detention, 23 
prosecution, sentencing, commitment, incarceration, probation, parole, supervised release, 24 
deferred prosecution agreements, deferred sentencing agreements, deferred disposition 25 
agreements, and consent decrees. 26    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
 “(2) The CJCC shall include in the report information and context to aid the 27 
general public in interpretation of the data. 28 
“(3) Prior to submitting and posting aggregate data, the CJCC shall provide each 29 
agency that supplies data at least one week to review and comment on the data presentation and 30 
any analysis relevant to the agency. The CJCC shall review the feedback provided by agencies 31 
and determine, in its sole discretion, whether to revise the presentation and analysis accordingly. 32 
“(b-6) The CJCC shall post the following year-to-date data on its website monthly, 33 
beginning with the earliest year for which CJCC is able to obtain historical data:  34 
 “(1) Arrests for violent crimes committed by juveniles and adults, by offense; and 35 
 “(2) Gun violence and homicide counts and rates citywide and by ward, 36 
neighborhood, and police service area.”.    37 
Sec. 3. Section 5 of the Prioritizing Public Safety Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, 38 
passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-396), is repealed.  39 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 40 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 41 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 42 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 43 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  44 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 45 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 60-day period of Congressional review 46    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	3 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 47 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 48 
Columbia Register. 49 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 50