District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0551 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/01/2023

                    ________________________________________________________________________________________ 
400 Sixth Street NW, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20001-5790, (202) 727-3400, Fax (202) 730-0484 
 
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Office of the Attorney General 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
 
November 1, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson, Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed 
emergency legislation, the “Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0043 with Edelson PC Approval and 
Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024,” and an accompanying emergency declaration 
resolution to approve the award of the proposed definitive multiyear Contract Number DCCB-
2023-F-0043 to Edelson PC. 
 
From time to time, the Office of the Attorney General (OAG) requires the assistance of outside 
counsel to carry out its mission. Drawing on the resources of specialized outside counsel allows 
OAG to vastly expand the types of cases it can bring and the rights it can enforce. Outside counsel 
services are especially helpful in matters involving complex facts and legal theories, often with 
national or multi-national targets.  This contract arranges for Edelson PC to provide OAG with 
outside legal services to pursue Consumer Protection Procedures Act claims against Meta 
Platforms, Inc. and Instagram, LLC related to their use of deceptive and unfair trade practices 
that target and harm children.  
 
The contract is a definitive multi-year, contingency-fee contract. With contingency-fee contracts, 
the amount the contractor will receive depends on if and when the District realizes a monetary 
recovery; the contractor will not receive any compensation for the costs it incurs or for the 
services it provides if the District never realizes a monetary recovery. The not-to-exceed amount 
of this contract is $55 million, and the base period of performance is from the date of award 
through five years thereafter. This contract will definitize a letter contract awarded on August 17, 
2023. 
 
If you have any questions, please contact Deputy Attorney General Candyce Phoenix at (202) 
788-2066 or Candyce.Phoenix@dc.gov. I look forward to favorable consideration of this 
contract. 
 
   Sincerely, 
 
   Brian L. Schwalb 
Attorney General 
Enclosures 
  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
ChfurmanPhi!Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Attorney General 
A BILL 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
16 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0043 with Edelson 
17 PC, to provide legal services to the Office 	of the Attorney General, and 	to authorize 
18 payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract. 
19 
20 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
21 act may be cited as the "Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0043 with Edelson PC Approval and 
22 Payment Authorization Emergency Act 	of 2023 ". 
23 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
24 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.
C. Official Code§ 1-204.51), and section 202 	of the 
25 Procurement Practices Reform Act 	of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
26 Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0043 
27 with Edelson PC, to provide legal services 
to the Office of the Attorney General for a consumer 
28 protection matter, and authorizes payment 
in the not-to-exceed amount of $55 million for goods 
29 and services received and to be received under Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0043. 
30 Sec. 
3. The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement provided by the Chief Financial 
31 Officer 
as the fiscal impact statement required by section 4a 	of the General Legislative 
32 Procedures Act 
of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.	C. Official Code§ 1-
33 301.47a).  Sec. 4.   This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of 34 
veto by the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no 35 
longer than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 36 
Section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 37 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)).  38