District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0562 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/06/2023

                     
 
1 
 _______________________ 1 
Councilmember Anita Bonds 2 
 3 
 4 
A BILL 5 
_______________ 6 
 7 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 
______________________ 9 
 10 
To amend, on an emergency basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip 11 
Credit Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the first increase to the 12 
tipped minimum wage takes effect from January 1, 2023, to May 1, 2023. 13 
 14 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 15 
act may be cited as the "Tipped Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Second Emergency 16 
Amendment Act of 2023". 17 
Sec. 2. Section 4(f)(3) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992, effective March 18 
25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9-	248; D.C. Official Code § 32-	1003), is amended by striking the phrase 19 
“January 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “May 1, 2023” in its place. 20 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 21 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 22 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 23 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 24 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 25 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 26 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 27 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 28   
 
2 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 29 
D.C. Official Code §1-	204.12(a)). 30