District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0562 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/07/2023

                     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
_______________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992 to reflect the 
date on which the first increase to the tipped minimum wage took effect after the 
effective date of Initiative Measure No. 82 – the District of Columbia Tip Credit 
Elimination Act of 2022. 
. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the "Tipped Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Second Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023". 
 
Sec. 2. Section 4(f)(3) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992, effective March 
25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9-248; D.C. Official Code § 32-1003(f)(3)), is amended by striking the 
phrase “January 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “May 1, 2023” in its place. 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
 
 
 
 
   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code §1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia