District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0570 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 09/17/2024

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A BILL 1 
  2 
25-570 3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
________________________ 7 
 8  9  10 	To amend the Public Access to Automated External Defibrillator Act of 2000 to define the term 11 
cardiac emergency response plan and require schools to establish cardiac emergency 12 
response plans.  13 
 14 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 15 
act may be cited as the “Cardiac Planning and Response (“CPR”) Amendment Act of 2024”. 16 
 Sec. 2. The Public Access to Automated External Defibrillator Act of 2000, effective 17 
April 27, 2001 (D.C. Law 13-278; D.C. Official Code § 7-2371.01 et seq	.), is amended as 18 
follows: 19 
 (a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 7-2371.01) is amended as follows: 20 
 (1) A new paragraph (1A) is added to read as follows: 21 
  “(1A) “CERP” means a cardiac emergency response plan, which is a written 22 
document that establishes the specific steps to be taken to reduce death from cardiac arrest in any 23 
setting, be it a school, community organization, workplace, or sports facility.”. 24 
 (2) A new paragraph (2B-i) is added to read as follows: 25 
  “(2B-i) “Department” means the Fire and Emergency Medical Services 26 
Department.”.  27    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 (b) Section 3c (D.C. Official Code § 7-	2371.02c) is amended as follows: 28 
 (1) The lead-in language is amended by striking the phrase “Within 120 days after 29 
the effective date of the Public Safety Telecommunicator and District School CPR and AED 30 
Training Amendment Act of 2016, passed on 2nd reading on June 21, 2016 (Enrolled version of 31 
Bill 21-669), each school” and inserting the phrase “Each school” in its place.  32 
 (2) Subsection (a) is amended as follows: 33 
 (A) Paragraph (1) is amended by striking the semicolon and inserting the 34 
phrase “, and by the beginning of School Year 2025-	2026 adopt and implement a CERP 35 
compliant with (a -1)(1);” in its place.  36 
 (B) Paragraph (2) is amended to read as follows:  37 
 “(2) Have at least one AED on-site at the school in a location that is identified in 38 
the school’s CERP and complies with guidelines set by the American Heart Association, 39 
American Red Cross, or another nationally recognized, evidence-based standard;” 40 
 (C) Paragraph (3) is amended by striking the phrase “guidelines and 41 
includes” and inserting the phrase “guidelines, is described in the school’s CERP, and includes” 42 
in its place.   43 
 (D) Paragraph (7) is amended by striking the period and inserting the 44 
phrase “and provide them with the school’s CERP.” in its place.  45 
 (2) A new subsection (a -1) is added to read as follows: 46    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
 “(a-1)(1) The Department, in collaboration with the Office of the State Superintendent of 47 
Education and other stakeholders as needed , shall develop, maintain, and make accessible to 48 
schools a model CERP that addresses the appropriate use of school personnel and protocols for 49 
responding to incidents involving an individual experiencing cardiac arrest while on school 50 
grounds, specifically including during a school’s athletic events and practices on school grounds.  51 
 “(2) The model CERP shall: 52 
 “(A) Integrate evidence- based core elements, such as those recommended 53 
by the American Heart Association, American Red Cross, or other nationally recognized 54 
evidence-based core elements; and 55 
 “(B) Include guidance on the following components:  56 
 “(i) Establishing a cardiac emergency response team that includes 57 
the individuals referenced in subsection (a)	(5) of this section and members’ contact information;  58 
 “(ii) Activating the cardiac emergency response team in response 59 
to an incident of cardiac arrest; 60 
 “(iii) Appropriately locating AEDs and performing routine 61 
maintenance, as required by subsection (a)(2) and (3) of this section; 62 
 “(iv) Maintaining ongoing staff training in CPR and AED use in 63 
accordance with subsection (a) (5) of this section; 64 
 “(v) Practicing CERP protocols through the use of drills; 65    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
4 
 
 “(vi	) Protocols for communicating with the Department and other 66 
emergency medical services in response to an incident of cardiac arrest; and 67 
  “(vii) Regular annual review and evaluation of the CERP	.”. 68 
 (2) Subsection (b) is amended by adding a new paragraph (1A) to read as follows:  69 
 “(1A) The Mayor shall establish a procedure for monitoring school adherence to 70 
the requirements set forth in subsection (a) of this section.”. 71 
Sec 3. Fiscal impact statement. 72 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 73 
impact statement required by 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 74 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 75 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 76 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 77 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and a 30-day period of Congressional review 78 
as provided in sections 602(c)(1) of the district of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 79 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)). 80