1 ______________________________ ______________________________ 2 Councilmember Trayon White, Sr. Councilmember Brooke Pinto 3 4 5 6 ______________________________ 7 Councilmember Christina Henderson 8 9 10 A BILL 11 12 ________ 13 14 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 15 16 ________________ 17 18 19 To amend, on a temporary basis, the District of Columbia Public Emergency Act of 1980 to 20 authorize the Mayor to extend the duration of public emergencies related to the opioid 21 crisis and juvenile crime and to clarify the types of diseases and other circumstances that 22 may constitute a public emergency. 23 24 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 25 act may be cited as the “ Opioid Crisis and Juvenile Crime Public Emergencies Extension 26 Authorization T emporary Amendment Act of 2023 ”. 27 Sec. 2. The District of Columbia Public Emergency Act of 1980, effective March 5, 1981 28 (D.C. Law 3-149; D.C. Official Code § 7- 2301 et seq.), is amended as follows: 29 (a) Section 2(3)(I) ( D.C. Official Code § 7- 2301(3)(I)) is amended by striking the phrase 30 “Outbreak of a communicable disease” and inserting the phrase “ Outbreak of a communicable 31 disease, or significant existence of a deadly or otherwise dangerous disease , disorder, condition, 32 or activity,” in its place. 33 (b) Section 7 (D.C. Official Code § 7- 2306) is amended by adding a new subsection (c -1) 34 to read as follows: 35 2 “(c-1)(1) Notwithstanding subsections (b) and (c) of this section, the 36 Mayor may extend the 15- day November 13, 2023, emergency executive order declaring a 37 public emergency in response to the opioid crisis (Mayor’s Order 2023- 141) and the 15- day 38 November 13, 2023, emergency executive order declaring a public emergency in response to 39 juvenile crime (Mayor’s Order 2023-141) until March 31, 2024. After the extension s authorized 40 by this subsection, the Mayor may extend the emergency orders for additional 15- day periods 41 pursuant to subsection (b) or (c) of this subsection. 42 “(2) Notwithstanding section 5(b) (D.C. Official Code § 7- 2304(b)), the 43 Mayor shall comply with all District laws when exercising her authority pursuant to Mayor’s 44 Order 2023-141, including those laws stated in Mayor’s Order 2023- 141 to be subject to waiver, 45 suspension, or modification; except, that the Mayor may waive the requirements of the following 46 laws to respond to the emergencies declared in Mayor’s Order 2023- 141: 47 “(A) Title IV of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, 48 effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18- 371; D.C. Official Code § 2- 354.01 et seq. ). 49 “(3) The Mayor shall, prior to any exercise of the authority granted by this 50 paragraph, provide written notice to the Council. Such notice shall include, at a minimum: 51 “(A) Citations to the law or laws being waived; 52 “(B) In any instance where the Mayor is waiving procurement 53 laws, a summary of each proposed procurement, which summary shall include: 54 “(i) A description of the specific goods or services to be 55 procured; 56 “(i) The source selection method, including whether the 57 procurement was competitively sourced; 58 3 “‘(iii) The contract amount and the source of funds, 59 whether federal or local; 60 “(iv) The name and certified business enterprise status of 61 the proposed awardee; and 62 “(v) An explanation regarding why expedited procurement 63 procedures are necessary to meet the specific need identified.”. 64 Sec. 3. Applicability. 65 Section 2(a) shall apply as of November 13, 2023. 66 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 67 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 68 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 69 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 70 Sec. 5. Effective date. 71 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 72 the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30- day period of Congressional review 73 as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 74 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- 206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the 75 District of Columbia Register. 76 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 77