District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0582 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/30/2023

                    1 
 
     _____________________________ 1 
           Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
 8 
_________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public  17 
Service Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes to extend  18 
the allowable holdover period of the People ’s Counsel until a successor takes office. 19 
 20 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 
act may be cited as the “	People’s Counsel Holdover Extension Emergency 	Amendment Act of 22 
2023”. 23 
Sec. 2. Section 1 of An Act To provide a People’s Counsel for the Public Service 24 
Commission in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes, approved January 2, 1975 (88 25 
Stat. 1975; D.C. Official Code 34-	804), is amended by adding a new subsection (b-	1) to read as 26 
follows: 27 
 “(b-1) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section and section 2(c) of the Confirmation 28 
Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-	523.01(c)), a 29 
person appointed to the People’s Counsel may serve in a holdover capacity after the expiration of 30 
his or her term until his or her successor takes office.”	. 31 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 32 
Section 2 shall apply as of December 5, 2023. 33  2 
 
Sec 4. Fiscal impact statement. 34 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 35 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 36 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 37 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 38 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 39 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 40 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 41 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 42 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)).  43