1 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL A BILL 1 2 3 4 5 6 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 7 8 9 10 11 12 To establish a prevailing wage for workers employed on underground utility work by a 13 contractor or subcontractor of a gas company or an electric company, and to provide for 14 wage enforcement by the government of the District of Columbia. 15 16 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 17 act may be cited as the “Electrical and Gas Utility Underground Work Wage Act of 2024”. 18 19 Sec. 2. Definitions. 20 21 For the purposes of this act, the term: 22 (1) “Covered employer” means a contractor of a gas company or an electric 23 company contracted to perform underground utility work in a contract amount over $250,000. 24 (2) “Davis-Bacon Act” means An Act Relating to the rate of wages for laborers 25 and mechanics employed on public buildings of the United States and the District of Columbia 26 by contractors and subcontractors, and for other purposes, approved March 3, 1931 (46 Stat. 27 1494; 40 U.S.C. 3141 et seq ). 28 (3) "Electric company" shall have the same meaning as in section 8 of An Act 29 Making appropriations to provide for the expenses of the government of the District of Columbia 30 for the fiscal year ending June thirtieth, nineteen hundred and fourteen, and for other purposes, 31 approved March 4, 1913 (37 Stat. 976; D.C. Official Code § 34-207) (“Act”). 32 2 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL (4) “Gas company” shall have the same meaning as in section 8 of the Act ( D.C. 33 Official Code § 34-209). 34 (5) “Prevailing wage” means the wage paid to specified categories of workers , as 35 described in section 3, doing underground utility work. 36 (6) “Underground utility work ” means work pursuant to a contract awarded to a 37 covered employer by a gas company or an electric company in an amount over $250,000 for 38 which a permit is required under section 6 of the Underground Facilities Protection Act of 1980, 39 effective March 4, 1981 (D.C. Law 3- 127; D.C. Official Code § 34- 2705) (“Underground 40 Facilities Protection Act”) or D.C. Official Code § 47- 2718 to excavate a street or other public 41 space for the purpose of installing, maintaining, replacing, demolishing, as defined in section 42 2(1) of the Underground Facilities Protection Act (D.C. Official Code § 34-2701(1)), or 43 removing a utility line or underground facility. The term includes traffic control and all other 44 construction tasks necessary to perform and complete the underground utility work. 45 Sec. 3. Prevailing wage requirement. 46 (a)(1) Within 180 days after the effective date of this act, t he underground utility work 47 prevailing wage for the following categories of workers shall be the equivalent of the prevailing 48 wage, including fringe benefits, under the Davis-Bacon Act, as published in the Washington D.C. 49 wage determination by the U.S. Department of Labor (“Wage and Hour Division”) : 50 (A) Foreman (Group 5 of Laborers (Heavy & Highway & Sewer & Water 51 Line Construction); 52 (B) Crew Leader (Group 3 of Laborers (Heavy & Highway & Sewer and 53 3 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL Water Lines) 54 (C) Skilled Laborer/Pipe Layer (Group 1 Laborers (Heavy & Highway & 55 Sewer and Water Lines); 56 (D) Operator (Group 3 (Sewer, Gas, Waterline Construction); and 57 (E) Truck Driver (Heavy & Highway). 58 (2) If a category of workers as listed in paragraph (1) (A) through (E) of this 59 subsection is no longer published by the Wage and Hour Division, the Mayor shall by rule 60 establish and apply an alternative classification. 61 (b) A covered employer awarded a contract for underground utility work shall pay its 62 workers described in subsection (a) of this subsection or as established by rule who are 63 performing duties pursuant to the contract no less than the prevailing wage . 64 (c) If a subcontractor to a covered employer receives over $50,000 and the receipt of those 65 funds is from the contract with a gas company or an electric company, the subcontractor shall pay 66 its workers performing duties described in subsection (a) of this section pursuant to the contract 67 no less than the prevailing wage. 68 (d) Notwithstanding the adoption of the Davis-Bacon wage rates, the enforcement 69 provisions of the Davis-Bacon Act and its implementing regulations shall not apply to this act. 70 This act shall be enforced pursuant to section 6. 71 Sec. 4. Notification and record- keeping requirements. 72 (a) A covered employer subject to this act shall notify each subcontractor in writing of the 73 prevailing wage requirements. 74 4 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL (b) Covered employers and subcontractors subject to this act shall: 75 (1) Retain payroll records created and maintained in the regular course of business 76 under District of Columbia law for a period of at least 3 years or the prevailing federal standard 77 at the time the record is created, whichever is greater; and 78 (2) Acknowledge and abide by the rights of employees under the National Labor 79 Relations Act (29 U.S.C. § 157) . 80 Sec. 5. Nonliability of utility company. 81 A gas or an electric company shall not be liable for any claims pursuant to this act. 82 Sec. 6. Enforcement; rulemaking. 83 “(a) The mayor shall enforce this act consistent with existing wage enforcement in the 84 District. 85 (b) The Mayor, pursuant to Title I of the District of Columbia Administrative Procedure 86 Act, approved October 21, 1968 (82 Stat. 1204; D.C. Official Code § 2- 501 et seq.), may issue 87 rules as necessary to implement this act. 88 Sec. 7. Applicability. 89 This act shall apply 180 days after its effective date. 90 Sec. 8. Fiscal impact statement. 91 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 92 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 93 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 94 Sec. 9. Effective date. 95 5 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 96 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and a 30-day period of congressional review 97 as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 98 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- 206.02(c)(1)). 99