District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0592 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/04/2023

                    _______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
_____ 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
____________ 10 
 11 
To amend on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Rental Housing Act of 1985 12 
to maintain a moratorium on voluntary agreements.  13 
 14 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 15 
be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency 16 
Amendment Act of 2023	”. 17 
Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6-	10; D.C. 18 
Official Code § 42-	3501.01 et seq .)), is amended by adding a new section 215a to read as 19 
follows:  20 
"Sec. 215a. (a) Notwithstanding the requirements of section 215, tenants and housing 21 
providers shall not enter into a voluntary agreement pursuant to section 215(a) for 1 year	.  22 
"(b) Subsection (a) of this section shall not affect any voluntary agreements that have 23 
already been approved by the Rent Administrator pursuant to section 215(b) prior to the 24 
applicability date of the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020, passed on 25 
2nd reading December 15, 2020 (enrolled version of Bill 23-878).". 26 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 27 
This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023. 28 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 29 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 30  2 
 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 31 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 32 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 33 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 34 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 35 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 36 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 37 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 38 
 39 
 40