District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0688 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/05/2024

                     ________________	_______________ 1 
 Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
 8 
_________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Act of 17 
2016 to extend the completion date for rehabilitation of houses in Historic Anacostia. 18 
 19 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
act may be cited as the “Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Extension 21 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 22 
 Sec. 2. Section 2(b) of the Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Act of 23 
2016, effective March 11, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-223; 64 DCR 182), is amended as follows: 24 
 (a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “2000 P Street, N.W., Suite 320, 25 
Washington, D.C. 20036” and inserting the phrase “1307 New Hampshire Avenue, NW, Suite 26 
400, Washington, DC 20036”.  27 
(b) Subsection (b) is amended by striking the phrase “5 years” and inserting the phrase 28 
“10 years” in its place.   29 
 Sec. 3. Applicability.  30 
 This act shall apply as of March 15, 2023. 31 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 32   The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 33 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 34 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   35 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 36 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 37 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 38 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 39 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 40 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 41