District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0699 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/21/2024

                    ________________________________________________________________________________________ 
400 Sixth Street NW, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20001-5790, (202) 727-3400, Fax (202) 730-0484 
 
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Office of the Attorney General 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
 
February 21, 2024 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman, Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW 
Washington, DC 20004  
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed 
emergency legislation, the “Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP 
Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024” and accompanying emergency 
declaration resolution (“legislation”) to approve the award of the proposed definitive multiyear 
Contract Number DCCB-2024-F-0010 to Tycko & Zavareei LLP. 
 
This contract arranges for outside legal counsel from Tycko & Zavareei LLP to assist OAG with 
an investigation and potential litigation against identified targets for violations of the Consumer 
Protection Procedures Act. The contract is a definitive multi-year, contingency-fee contract with 
a not-to-exceed contract amount of $60 million. The base period of performance is from the date 
of award through five years thereafter. This contract will definitize a letter contract awarded on 
January 9, 2024. 
 
If you have any questions, please contact Deputy Attorney General Candyce Phoenix at (202) 788-
2066 or Candyce.Phoenix@dc.gov.  
 
Sincerely, 
 
Brian L. Schwalb 
Attorney General Enclosures 
  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
~~ 
GtrtiirmanPhl1 Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Attorney General 
A BILL 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT 
OF COLUMBIA 
16 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & 
17 Zavareei LLP, to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney General, and 	to 
18 authorize payment for the goods and services received and 	to be received under the 
19 contract. 
20 
21 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
22 act may be cited as the "Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP 
23 Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 	of 2024". 
24 Sec. 2. Pursuant 
to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
25 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code§ 1-204.51), and section 202 	of the 
26 Procurement Practices Reform Act 	of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
27 Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 
28 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP, 	to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney General for a 
29 consumer protection matter, and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount 	of $60 million 
30 for goods and services received and to be received under Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement provided by the Chief Financial 
32 Officer as the fiscal impact statement required by section 4a 	of the General Legislative  Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-33 
301.47a). 34 
Sec. 4.   This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of 35 
veto by the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no 36 
longer than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 37 
Section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 38 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  39  1 
 
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
O
FFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL 
 
 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB   	PRIVILEGED AND CONFIDENTIAL  
ATTORNEY GENERAL 	ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION 
 
 
 
LEGAL COUNSEL DIVISION 
 
  
MEMORANDUM
 
 
TO:  Kirti Suri
 
Assistant Attorney General 
  Commercial Division 
 
 
FROM: Megan D. Browder 
Deputy Attorney General  
Legal Counsel Division  
  
DATE: February 2, 2024 
  
SUBJECT:  Legal Sufficiency Review of the “Contract No. DCCB	-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & 
Zavareei LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024” and 
Accompanying Emergency D	eclaration Resolution
 
(AE-24-188) 
_____________________________________________________________________________________ 
 
This memorandum responds to your request that the Legal Counsel Division 	(the “Division”) provide a 
legal sufficiency review of the “ Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP Approval 
and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024” and the accompanying emergency declaration 
resolution (together, “the Legislation”). 
 
Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 
803; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.51), and section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, 
effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-	371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Legislation approves 
multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP, to provide legal services to the 
Office of the Attorney General for a consumer protection matter, and authorizes payment in the not-to-
exceed amount of $60 	million for goods and services received and to be received under Contract No. DCCB-
2024-F-0010.
1
 
  
The legislation is legally sufficient, 	and I have attached a Certificate of Legal Sufficiency for your use. If 
you have any questions regarding this memorandum, please contact Ben Moskowitz, Assistant Deputy 
Attorney General, Legal Counsel Division, at (202) 724-5565, or me at (202) 724-5524. 
 
MDB/bem
 
1
 This Division has not reviewed the underlying contract for legal sufficiency and offers no opinion as to its legal sufficiency.      
 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 409, Washington, D.C. 20004   Phone (202) 724-5524   Email: megan.browder@dc.gov 
 
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Legal Counsel Division 
   
   
 
MEMORANDUM 
 TO:                 Tomás Talamante 
Director  
Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs 
 FROM:           Megan D. Browder 
                         Deputy Attorney General 
                         Legal Counsel Division 
 DATE:            February 2, 2024 SUBJECT:  Legal Sufficiency Review of the “Contract No. DCCB	-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & 
Zavareei LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024” and 
Accompanying Declaration Resolution
 
(AE-24-188)  
________________________________________________________________________  
This is to Certify that this Office has reviewed the above-	referenced 
legislation and that we have found it to be legally sufficient.  If you have any questions in this 	regard, please do not hesitate to call me at (202) 724-	5524. 
  
 
 
_________________________________ 
Megan D. Browder