District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0720 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2024

                    1 
 
    1 
 	______________________________ 2 
                                                 Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
 8 
_________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend, on a temporary basis, section 25-113 of the District of Columbia Official Code to 17 
continue the extension of the Streatery Program through 2024 and to clarify endorsement 18 
deadlines for certain classes of licensees. 19 
 20 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 
act may be cited as the “Streatery Program and Endorsement Deadline Temporary Amendment 22 
Act of 2024”. 23 
 24 
 Sec. 2. Section 25-113(a)(6) of the District of Columbia Code is amended as follows:  25 
 (a)  Strike the phrase “2022 and 2023” wherever it appears and insert the phrase “2022, 26 
2023 and 2024” in its place.  27 
 (b) Subparagraph (A)(i)(II) is amended by striking the semicolon and inserting the 28 
phrase “annually with the fee for 2024 due by April 1, 2024; except, that an on-premises retailer 29 
licensee, class C/T, D/T, C/N, or D/N, or a manufacturer licensee class B, shall pay the fee for 30 
2024 by September 30, 2024;” in its place.  31 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 32  2 
 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 33 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 34 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 35 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 36 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 37 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and a 30-day period of congressional 38 
review as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 39 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)).  40 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 41