District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0720 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/05/2024

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A BILL 1 
 2 
25-720 3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
__________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To amend, on a temporary basis, section 25-113 of the District of Columbia Official Code to 10 
continue the extension of the Streatery Program through 2024 and to clarify endorsement 11 
deadlines for certain classes of licensees. 12 
 13 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 14 
act may be cited as the “Streatery Program and Endorsement Deadline Temporary Amendment 15 
Act of 2024”. 16 
 17 
 Sec. 2. Section 25-113(a)(6) of the District of Columbia Code is amended as follows:  18 
 (a)  Strike the phrase “2022 and 2023” wherever it appears and insert the phrase “2022, 19 
2023 and 2024” in its place.  20 
 (b) Subparagraph (A)(i)(II) is amended by striking the semicolon and inserting the 21 
phrase “annually with the fee for 2024 due by April 1, 2024; except, that an on-premises retailer 22 
licensee, class C/T, D/T, C/N, or D/N, or a manufacturer licensee class B, shall pay the fee for 23 
2024 by September 30, 2024;” in its place.  24 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 25 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 26 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 27 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 28    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 29 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 30 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and a 30-day period of congressional 31 
review as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 32 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)).  33 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 34