District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0722 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2024

                    1 
______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2 
 3 
AN ACT 4 
 5 
_________ 6 
 7 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 
 9 
__________________ 10 
 11 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 12 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2001 to require the Criminal Justice Coordinating 13 
Council (“CJCC”) to transmit a report on risk factors for youth involvement in future gun 14 
violence, to require that certain District agencies provide the CJCC with information 15 
necessary to complete the report, and to authorize the Department of Health Care Finance 16 
to disclose health and human services information to the CJCC for the purposes of 17 
research on and analysis of criminal justice and public safety issues; to amend the Data-18 
Sharing and Information Coordination Amendment Act of 2010 to allow the disclosure of 19 
health and human services information to aid in the development of the report on risk 20 
factors for youth involvement in future gun violence; and to amend the District of 21 
Columbia Mental Health Information Act of 1978 to authorize the disclosure of mental 22 
health information to aid in the development of the report on risk factors for youth 23 
involvement in future gun violence. 24 
 25 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 26 
act may be cited as the “Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing Temporary 27 
Amendment Act of 2024”. 28 
 Sec. 2. Section 1505 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 29 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 30 
Code § 22–4234), is amended as follows: 31 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended by adding a new paragraph (9) to read as follows: 32 
“(9) Conduct research and analysis on matters affecting public safety and criminal 33 
justice, including research and analysis utilizing behavioral health, physical health, employment, 34 
and education data.”.  35 
(b) A new subsection (a-1) is added to read as follows: 36  2 
“(a-1) Agencies are authorized to provide personally identifying information to the 37 
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council to aid in the development of reports pursuant to this 38 
section.”. 39 
(c) A new subsection (d) is added to read as follows: 40 
 “(d)(1) The CJCC shall conduct research and analysis, and develop reports, pertaining to 41 
childhood factors that increase the likelihood of future involvement in gun violence for young 42 
adults.  43 
“(2) Upon request by the CJCC, and to aid in the development of reports 44 
produced pursuant to this section, the Department of Health Care Finance (“DHCF”) shall 45 
provide, or cause to be provided, the following information to the CJCC on adult individuals 46 
included in a given study sample for the period of time when the individuals were under 18 years 47 
of age, including any associated personal identifying information: 48 
 “(A) Demographic data, including: 49 
 “(i) Name, address, and date of birth; 50 
 “(ii) Sex; 51 
 “(iii) Gender; 52 
 “(iv) Race; and 53 
 “(v) Ethnicity; 54 
 “(B) Enrollment data, including; 55 
 “(i) Eligibility start date; 56 
 “(ii) Eligibility end date; and 57 
 “(iii) Eligibility basis;  58 
 “(C) Claims data with mental, behavioral, and neurodevelopmental 59 
disorder diagnoses; and 60  3 
 “(D) Claims data with mental health procedures.  61 
“(3) Where necessitated by District or federal law or regulations, DHCF may 62 
enter into a Memorandum of Understanding with CJCC regarding the disclosure of data and 63 
other information pursuant to this section.”. 64 
Sec. 3. Section 102(a)(5) of the Data-Sharing and Information Coordination Amendment 65 
Act of 2010, effective December 4, 2010 (D.C. Law 18-273; D.C. Official Code § 7-242(a)(5)), 66 
is amended by striking the phrase “report required by section 1505(b-3) of the Criminal Justice 67 
Coordinating Council for the District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 68 
3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3)” and inserting the phrase “reports 69 
required by section 1505(b-3) and (d) of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the 70 
District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; 71 
D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3) and (d))” in its place. 72 
Sec. 4. Section 302 of the District of Columbia Mental Health Information Act of 1978, 73 
effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-136; D.C. Official Code § 7-1203.02), is amended by 74 
striking the phrase “section 1505(b-3) of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the 75 
District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; 76 
D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3)” and inserting the phrase “section 1505(b-3) and (d) of the 77 
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, 78 
effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3) and (d))” in its 79 
place. 80 
Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 81 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 82 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 83 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 84  4 
Sec. 6. Effective date.  85 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 86 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 60-day period of congressional review 87 
as provided in section 602(c)(2) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 88 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(2)), and publication in the District of 89 
Columbia Register.   90 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 91