District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0729 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2024

                     
1 
                                                                                         1 
 ____________________________ 2 
                                                                     Councilmember Charles Allen 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_____________ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
 11 
_____________________ 12 
 13 
 14 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Green Building Act of 2006 	to delay the submission of 15 
benchmark and Energy Star statements of energy performance by private	ly-owned 16 
buildings to the Department of Energy and Environment from April 1, 2024, to July 1, 17 
2024.  18 
 19 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
act may be cited as the “Energy Benchmarking Reporting Extension Emergency Amendment Act 21 
of 2024”. 22 
 Sec. 2. Section 4(c)(2)(A)(ii)(I) of the Green Building Act of 2006, effective March 8, 2007 23 
(D.C. Law 16- 234; D.C. Official Code § 6-	1451.03(c)(2)(A)(ii)(I)), is amended by striking the 24 
phrase “In 2011 only” and inserting the phrase “ In 2011 and 2024 only” in its place. 25 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.  26 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 27 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 28 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a).  29 
 Sec. 4. Effective date.  30 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 31 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 32 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 33   
2 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 34 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 35