District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0732 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/05/2024

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
A BILL 1 
 2 
25-732  3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
_____________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Office of Citizen Complaint Review Establishment Act of 10 
1998 to expand the membership of the Police Complaints Board, and to allow the Office 11 
of Police Complaints’ Executive Director to initiate their own complaint if they discover 12 
evidence of abuse or misuse of police powers that was not alleged in the original complaint, 13 
including the failure to intervene or report to a supervisor when another officer used 14 
excessive force, engaged in other forms of misconduct, or violated a rule or regulation; and 15 
to amend Chapter 3 of Title 14 of the District of Columbia Official Code to clarify that 16 
certain provisions only apply to a victim who is under the age of 18; and to amend the 17 
Department of Transportation Establishment Act of 2002 to make a technical amendment.  18 
 19 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
act may be cited as the “Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Technical Temporary 21 
Amendment Act of 2024”. 22 
 Sec. 2. The Office of Citizen Complaint Review Establishment Act of 1998, effective 23 
March 26, 1999 (D.C. Law 12-208; D.C. Official Code § 5-1101 et seq.), is amended as follows: 24 
 (a) Section 4 (D.C. Official Code § 5-1103) is amended by adding a new paragraph (3B) 25 
to read as follows:  26 
 “(3B) “MPD” means the Metropolitan Police Department.”.  27 
(b) Section 5(a) (D.C. Official Code § 5-1104(a)) is amended by striking the phrase “There 28 
is established a Police Complaints Board (“Board”). The Board shall be composed of 5 members, 29 
one of whom shall be a member of the MPD, and 4 of whom shall have no current affiliation with 30    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
any law enforcement agency.” and inserting the phrase “There is established a Police Complaints 31 
Board. The Board shall be composed of 9 members, which shall include one member from each 32 
Ward and one at-large member, none of whom, after the expiration of the term of the currently 33 
serving member of the MPD, shall be affiliated with any law enforcement agency.” in its place. 34 
 (c) Section 8 (D.C. Official Code § 5-1107) is amended as follows: 35 
 (1) A new subsection (g-1) is added to read as follows: 36 
 “(g-1)(1) If the Executive Director discovers evidence of abuse or misuse of police powers 37 
that was not alleged by the complainant in the complaint, the Executive Director may:  38 
 “(A) Initiate the Executive Director’s own complaint against the subject 39 
police officer; and 40 
 “(B) Take any of the actions described in subsection (g)(2) through (6) of 41 
this section. 42 
 “(2) The authority granted pursuant to paragraph (1) of this subsection shall include 43 
circumstances in which the subject police officer failed to: 44 
 “(A) Intervene in or subsequently report any use of force incident in which 45 
the subject police officer observed another law enforcement officer, including an MPD officer, 46 
utilizing excessive force or engaging in any type of misconduct, pursuant to MPD General Order 47 
901.07, its successor directive, or a similar local or federal directive; or 48 
 “(B) Immediately report to their supervisor any violations of the rules and 49 
regulations of the MPD committed by any other MPD officer, and each instance of their use of 50    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
force or a use of force committed by another MPD officer, pursuant to MPD General Order 201.26, 51 
or any successor directive.”. 52 
 (2) Subsection (h) is amended by striking the phrase “subsection (g)” and inserting 53 
the phrase “subsection (g) or (g-1)” in its place.   54 
 Sec. 3. Chapter 3 of Title 14 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended as 55 
follows: 56 
 (a) Section 14-310(b)(4) is amended as follows:  57 
 (1) Subparagraph (B) is amended by striking the phrase “whom the victim has” and 58 
inserting the phrase “whom a victim under 18 years of age has” in its place. 59 
 (2) Subparagraph (C) is amended by striking the phrase “the victim” and inserting 60 
the phrase “a victim who is under 18 years of age” in its place.  61 
 (b) Section 14-311(b)(4) is amended as follows:  62 
 (1) Subparagraph (B) is amended by striking the phrase “with whom the victim 63 
has” and inserting the phrase “with whom a victim under 18 years of age has” in its place. 64 
 (2) Subparagraph (C) is amended by striking the phrase “the victim” and inserting 65 
the phrase “a victim who is under 18 years of age” in its place. 66 
 (c) Section 14-312(b)(4) is amended as follows:  67 
 (1) Subparagraph (B) is amended by striking the phrase “with whom the victim 68 
has” and inserting the phrase “with whom a sexual assault victim under 18 years of age has” in its 69 
place. 70    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
4 
 (2) Subparagraph (C) is amended by striking the phrase “the sexual assault victim” 71 
and inserting the phrase “a sexual assault victim who is under 18 years of age” in its place. 72 
 Sec. 4. Technical amendment.  73 
 Section 9q(b) of the Department of Transportation Establishment Act of 2002, effective 74 
November 13, 2021 (D.C. Law 24-45; D.C. Official Code § 50-921.25(b)), is amended as follows:  75 
 (a) The lead-in language is amended as follows: 76 
 (1) Strike the phrase “deposited in the revenue from fines” and insert the phrase 77 
“deposited in the Fund revenue from fines” in its place. 78 
 (2) Strike the phrase “in excess of the following threshholds” and insert the phrase 79 
“in excess of the following thresholds” in its place. 80 
 (b) Paragraph (4) is amended by striking the figure “$227,341,000” and inserting the figure 81 
“$277,341,000” in its place. 82 
 Sec. 5. Applicability. 83 
 Section 2 shall expire on the applicability date of section 105 of the Comprehensive 84 
Policing and Justice Reform Amendment Act of 2022, effective April 21, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-345; 85 
70 DCR 953).  86 
 Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement.  87 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 88 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 89 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  90    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
5 
 Sec. 7. Effective date.  91 
 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 92 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 93 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 94 
1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 95 
Columbia Register. 96 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 97