District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0777 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/02/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
___________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
_____________________ 
 
To symbolically designate, on an emergency basis, the portion of the public alley system within 
Square 0179 abutting Lot 111, as Annie’s Way and to repeal the previous designation of 
Annie’s Way. 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Annie’s Way Designation Emergency Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Pursuant to sections 401, 403a, and 423 of the Street and Alley Closing and 
Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 4-201; D.C. Official 
Code §§ 9-204.01, 9-204.03a, and 9-204.23), the Council symbolically designates the portion of 
the public alley system within Square 0179 abutting Lot 111, as “Annie’s Way”. 
 
Sec. 3. The Annie’s Way Designation Act of 2014, effective April 30, 2014 (D.C. Law 
20-99; 61 DCR 1594), is repealed. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia