District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0805 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/06/2024

                       
 
 
 
 
1 
 
 
_____________________________ 
          Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 
 1 
 2 
 3 
A BILL 4 
 5 
_____________ 6 
 7 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 
 9 
__________________ 10 
 11 
 12 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Legalization of Marijuana 13 
for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to provide a deadline date by which existing 14 
cultivation centers and dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for additional 15 
medical cannabis facility licenses, to not allow a cultivation center to also hold an 16 
internet retailer license, to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants that 17 
tied for second and received the same total score after submitting a medical cannabis 18 
facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between 19 
November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center registration, to 20 
provide that other  cultivation center and dispensary registration applicants that scored 21 
150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to 22 
the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board during the same open application period shall be 23 
considered for a cultivation center or retailer registration, and to allow a cultivation center 24 
and dispensary registration applicant that scored 150 points or more to change the 25 
location of its facility without otherwise affecting the status of its application.  26 
 27 
 28 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 29 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Supplemental Congressional Review 30 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 31 
 32 
Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 33 
1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 34 
amended as follows: 35 
(a) Subsection (d) is amended as follows: 36     
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 (1) Paragraph (2) is amended by striking the phrase “retailer or online retailer 37 
license” and inserting the phrase “retailer license” in its place. 38 
 (2) A new paragraph (5) is added to read as follows: 39 
 “(5) Applications for additional licenses pursuant to paragraphs (1) through (3) of 40 
this subsection shall be filed with ABCA by the existing cultivation center or dispensary by May 41 
1, 2024.”.  42 
(b) Subsection (e)(1) is amended as follows 43 
 (1) Subparagraph (F) is amended by striking the phrase “retailer or internet 44 
retailer license” and inserting the phrase “retailer license” in its place. 45 
 (2) A new subparagraph (G) is added to read as follows: 46 
 “(G) No licensee holding a cultivation center license shall hold an internet 47 
retailer license.”.  48 
(c)  New subsections (w) and (x) are added to read as follows:  49 
 “(w)(1) The 2 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted a medical cannabis 50 
facility registration application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 51 
2022, that tied for second and received the same total score shall be awarded a cultivation center 52 
registration.  53 
 “(2) A cultivation center registration applicant not referenced in paragraph (1) of 54 
this subsection that scored 150 points or more during the same open application period shall be 55 
considered for a cultivation center registration after May 1, 2023; provided, that the applicant 56 
files a corrected application, including an application to change the facility location, with the 57 
ABC Board by May 1, 2024. An applicant that scored 150 points or higher shall be allowed to 58     
 
 
 
 
3 
 
change the location of the cultivation center facility on its application by May 1, 2024, without 59 
negatively affecting the status of the application.  60 
 “(3) An applicant that filed more than one cultivation center registration 61 
application during the open application period with one or more of the same owners shall be 62 
considered for only one cultivation center registration under this subsection.   63 
 “(4) An initial application fee paid by a cultivation center registration applicant 64 
that scored 150 points or higher shall be credited by ABCA toward the entire cost of the 65 
applicant’s cultivation center application fee. 66 
“(x)(1) A dispensary registration applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility 67 
registration application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, 68 
and received 150 points or more shall be considered for a retailer registration no earlier than 180 69 
calendar days after March 22, 2023. An applicant shall be allowed to change the location of the 70 
retailer facility on its application by May 1, 2024, without negatively affecting the status of the 71 
application.  72 
 “(2) An applicant that filed more than one dispensary registration application 73 
during the open application period with one or more of the same owners shall be considered for 74 
only one retailer registration under this subsection.   75 
 “(3) An initial application fee paid by a dispensary registration applicant that 76 
scored 150 points or higher shall be credited by ABCA toward the entire cost of the applicant’s 77 
retailer application fee.”. 78 
 79 
 80     
 
 
 
 
4 
 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 81 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 82 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 83 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a)).   84 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 85 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 86 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 87 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 88 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 89 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  90