District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0834 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/11/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Walter Reed Development Omnibus Act of 2016 to 
provide that revenues received from the Developer as Initial Consideration Payments 
under the Walter Reed Land and Disposition Agreement shall, after October 1, 2023, be 
deposited into the Walter Reed Reinvestment Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer 
to pay or reimburse certain costs of job creation and economic development of or related 
to the Walter Reed Redevelopment Site. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 
be cited as the “Walter Reed Development Assistance Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 6 of the Walter Reed Development Omnibus Act of 2016, effective May 
18, 2016 (D.C. Law 21-119; D.C. Official Code § 2-1227.05), is amended by adding a new 
subsection (b-1) to read as follows: 
 “(b-1) Notwithstanding subsection (b)(2) of this section and section 1094 of the Grant 
Administration Act of 2013, effective December 24, 2013 (D.C. Law 20-61; D.C. Official Code 
26 § 1-328.13), funds received from the Developer after October 1, 2023, as an installment of 
Initial Consideration Payment under the Walter Reed Land and Disposition Agreement shall 
be  deposited into the Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer to pay or reimburse costs it has 
incurred or will incur for the purposes set forth in subsection (c)(1) of this section.”.  
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia