District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0858 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 06/25/2024

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
A BILL 1 
 2 
25-858  3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
______________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To enact on a temporary basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 10 
voluntary agreements.  11 
 12 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 13 
be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 14 
Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6-10; D.C. 15 
Official Code § 42-3502.15a(a)), is amended by striking the phrase “for one year beginning on 16 
October 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “before January 1, 2025” in its place. 17 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 18 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 19 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 20 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 21 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 22 
 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 23 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 24 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 25    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 26 
Columbia Register. 27 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having effect.  28 
  29