District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0976 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/30/2024

                     
 
 
                                                                                                 1 
______________________________ 2 
 Councilmember Charles Allen 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
 8 
__________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Office of District Waterways Management Establishment 16 
Act of 2022 to make the process for Mayoral appointment of members of the District 17 
Waterways Advisory Commission consistent with that of similar commissions, to add the 18 
Department of Parks and Recreation as an ex-officio non-voting member of the District 19 
Waterways Advisory Commission, to adjust the Commission meeting schedule, to allow 20 
sufficient time for engagement with stakeholders and the District Waterways Advisory 21 
Commission in development of the Advisory Plan, and to provide the District Waterways 22 
Advisory Commission with authority to determine whether the Advisory Plan needs to be 23 
updated and extend the update period to at least every 3 years, and to amend the 24 
Confirmation Act of 1978 to make a conforming amendment. 25 
 26 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 27 
act may be cited as the “Office of District Waterways Management Establishment Emergency 28 
Amendment Act of 2024”. 29 
Sec. 2. The Office of District Waterways Management Establishment Act of 2022, 30 
effective March 22, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-336; D.C. Official Code § 8-191.01 et seq.), is amended 31 
as follows: 32 
(a) Section 3 (D.C. Official Code § 8-191.02) is amended as follows: 33 
(1) Subsection (b)(1)(A) is amended by striking the phrase “section 2(e) of the 34 
Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-141; D.C. Official Code § 1-35 
523.01(e)),” and inserting the phrase “section 2(f) of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective 36 
March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-141; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01(f)),” in its place. 37   
 
 
(2) Subsection (c) is amended as follows: 38 
(A) Paragraph (9) is amended by striking the phrase “; and” inserting a 39 
semicolon in its place. 40 
(B) Paragraph (10) is amended by striking the period and inserting the 41 
phrase “; and” in its place. 42 
(C) A new paragraph (11) is added to read as follows: 43 
“(11) The Department of Parks and Recreation.”. 44 
(3) Subsection (f) is amended by striking the phrase “once every month” and 45 
inserting the phrase “once every 2 months” in its place. 46 
(b) Section 4 (D.C. Official Code § 8-191.03) is amended as follows: 47 
(1) The lead-in language of subsection (a) is amended as follows: 48 
(A) Strike the phrase “one year” and insert the phrase “2 years” in its place. 49 
(B) Strike the phrase “develop and adopt” and insert the word “develop” in 50 
its place. 51 
(2) Subsection (b)(2) is amended by striking the phrase “At least 60 days prior to 52 
adoption of an Advisory Plan, the” and inserting the word “The” in its place. 53 
(3) Subsection (c) is amended to read as follows: 54 
“(c) After conclusion of the public comment period, and within 60 days after completing 55 
revisions, if any, the voting members of the Commission shall adopt the Advisory Plan. 56 
Thereupon, the Advisory Plan shall be submitted to the Office of Waterways Management for 57 
publication.”. 58 
(4) Subsection (d) is amended to read as follows: 59   
 
 
 “(d) If deemed necessary by the Commission, the Advisory Plan shall be updated at least 60 
once every 3 years, following the same process required for the initial Advisory Plan pursuant to 61 
subsections (b) and (c) of this section.”. 62 
Sec. 3. Section 2(f) of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 63 
2-141; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01(f)), is amended by adding a new paragraph (74) to read as 64 
follows: 65 
(a) Paragraph (72) is amended by striking the phrase “; and” and inserting a semicolon in 66 
its place. 67 
(b) Paragraph (73) is amended by striking the period and inserting the phrase “; and” in its 68 
place. 69 
(c) A new paragraph (74) is added to read as follows: 70 
 “(74) The Office of District Waterways Management, established by section 2(a) 71 
of the Office of District Waterways Management Establishment Act of 2022, effective March 22, 72 
2023 (D.C. Law 24-336; D.C. Official Code § 8-191.01 et seq.).”. 73 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 74 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 75 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 76 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  77 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 78 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 79 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 80 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 81 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 82 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 83