District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1005 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/24/2024

                    1 
 
            _______________________________ 1 
                                 Councilmember Charles Allen 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_________ 8 
 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
__________________ 13 
 14 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act 15 
of 2005 to clarify that the Mayor may promulgate rules and regulations to implement the 16 
provisions of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005, and 17 
to eliminate the requirement that all rules and regulations be submitted to the Council for 18 
a 45-day active review period. 19 
 20 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 
act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Rulemaking Clarification 22 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 23 
Sec. 2. Section 110 of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 24 
2005, effective February 15, 2006 (D.C. Law 16-51; D.C. Official Code § 8-151.10), is amended 25 
as follows: 26 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Mayor shall promulgate” and 27 
inserting the phrase “Mayor may promulgate” in its place. 28 
(b) Subsection (b) is repealed.  29 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 30 
This act shall apply as of July 29, 2021. 31 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 32  2 
 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 33 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 34 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 35 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 36 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 37 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 38 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 39 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 40 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 41