District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1006 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/12/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
______________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
___________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act 
of 2005 to clarify that the Mayor may promulgate rules and regulations to implement the 
provisions of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005, and 
to eliminate the requirement that all rules and regulations be submitted to the Council for 
a 45-day active review period. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Rulemaking Clarification 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 110 of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 
2005, effective February 15, 2006 (D.C. Law 16-	51; D.C. Official Code § 8	-151.10) , is amended 
as follows: 
(a) Subsection ( a) is amended by striking the phrase “Mayor shall promulgate” and 
inserting the phrase “Mayor may promulgate ” in its place. 
(b) Subsection (b) is repealed.  
 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of July 29, 2021. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and a 30-day period of congressional 
review as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-	206.02(c)(1)).     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia