District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1008 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/28/2024

                    1 
 
 1 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
 8 
 A BILL 9 
 10 
 11 
 12 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 
 14 
 15 
 16 
 17 
To order, on an emergency basis due to congressional review, the closing of a 10-foot-wide 18 
unimproved public alley in Square 3701 abutting Lots 85 and 88 in Northeast 19 
Washington, D.C. in Ward 5. 20 
 21 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 
act may be cited as the “Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-06220, Congressional 23 
Review Emergency Act of 2024”.  24 
 Sec. 2. (a) Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 25 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.04), and consistent with the Street 26 
and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 27 
4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9-201.01 et seq.), the Council finds that the portion of public alley in 28 
Square 5051, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 21-00136, is unnecessary for alley 29 
purposes and orders it closed with title to the land to vest as shown on the Surveyor’s plat.  30 
 (b) The ordering of this alley closing is contingent upon the property owner receiving the 31 
requisite public space approvals for parking and loading access prior to the recordation of the 32 
plat by the Surveyor. 33  2 
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability date. 34 
 This act shall apply as of October 24, 2024. 35 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 36 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 37 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 38 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 39 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 40 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 41 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 42 
than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 43 
section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 44 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 45