District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1008 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/29/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________________ 
 
 
To order, on an emergency basis due to congressional review, the closing of a 10-	foot-wide 
unimproved public alley in Square 3701 abutting Lots 85 and 88 in Ward 5. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “	Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-	06220, Congressional 
Review Emergency Act of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. (a) Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.04), and consistent with the Street 
and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 
4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9-	201.01 et seq .), the Council finds that a portion of the public alley 
system in Square 3701, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 23	-06220, is 
unnecessary for alley purposes and orders it closed with title to the land to vest as shown on the 
Surveyor’s plat.  
 (b) The ordering of this alley closing is contingent upon the property owner receiving the 
requisite public space approvals for parking and loading access prior to the recordation of the 
plat by the Surveyor. 
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability date. 
 This act shall apply as of October 24, 2024. 
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report for the Closing of 
a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-	06220, Act of 2024, enacted on October 28, 2024 (D.C. 
Act 25-607; 71 DCR ____), as the fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General 
Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 
Code § 1- 301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 
section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia