District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1009 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/29/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
___________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_____________________ 
 
 
To order, on an emergency basis, the closing of two portions of the public alley system, including 
a 20-foot-wide segment in Square 5051 in Northeast, in Ward 7; and to amend Section 
47-4701 of the District of Columbia Official Code to clarify when a tax abatement 
financial analysis must be provided for a bill with a tax exemption or abatement that is 
not of general applicability.  
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That, this 
act may be cited as the “	Closing of a Public Alley in Square 5051, S.O. 21-	00136, Second 
Emergency Act of 2024”.  
 
 Sec. 2. (a) Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.04), and consistent with the Street 
and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 
4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9-	201.01 et seq .), the Council finds that certain portions of the 
public alley system in Square 5051, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 21-	00136, 
are unnecessary for alley purposes and orders them closed with title to the land to vest as shown 
on the Surveyor’s plat.  
 (b) The ordering of this alley closing is contingent upon satisfaction of the conditions set 
forth by Washington Gas in the official file for S.O. 20-	00136 prior to the recordation of the plat 
by the Surveyor. 
 
 Sec. 3. Section 47-	4701(a) of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by 
striking the phrase “shall not receive a Council hearing” and inserting the phrase “shall not be 
considered on final reading by the Council ” in its place.  
 
 Sec. 4. Applicability. 
 (a) Section 2 of this act shall apply as of October 24, 2024. 
 (b) Section 3 of this act shall apply as of November 14, 2024. 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 6. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 
than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 
section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia