District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1013 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/28/2024

                     
1 
 
   1 
  _____________________________ 2 
   Councilmember Brooke Pinto 3 
 4 
   5 
 6 
 7 
A BILL 8 
 9 
_________________________ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
_________________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Residential Tranquility Act of 2010 to prohibit persons 17 
targeting a residence for purposes of a demonstration from using amplified sound devices 18 
in a residential zone and to prohibit a person as part of a group of 3 or more persons from 19 
targeting a residence for purposes of a demonstration between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m.; 20 
and to amend An Act To establish a code of law for the District of Columbia to prohibit a 21 
person from launching or throwing a projectile onto the residential property of another 22 
with the intent to cause fear, intimidate, or retaliate against any person living or working 23 
at that residence; and to amend the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government 24 
Improvement Act of 1997 to provide that the term expiration date for a Council 25 
appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be December 7th of the year in 26 
which the term expires. 27 
 28 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 29 
act may be cited as the “Residential Tranquility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 30 
Sec. 2. The Residential Tranquility Act of 2010, effective May 26, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-374; D.C. 31 
Official Code § 22-2751 et seq.) is amended as follows: 32 
(a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2751) is amended as follows: 33 
“(4) “Sound amplifying device” means any machine, device, or loudspeaker that 34 
amplifies sound of the human voice, music, or any other sound. The term “sound amplifying 35   
2 
 
device” shall not include automobile audio systems when used and heard only by the occupants 36 
of the vehicle in which the automobile audio system is installed, personal hearing aids, or 37 
headphones.”. 38 
(b) Section 3 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2752) is amended as follows: 39 
(1) Amend subsection (a) by striking the phrase “Between 10:00 p.m. and 7:00 40 
a.m” and inserting the phrase “Between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m.” in its place. 41 
(2) Add new subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows: 42 
“(a-1) It is unlawful for a person to target a residence for purposes of a demonstration 43 
while using a sound amplifying device in Residential Zones, Residential Flat Zones, or 44 
Residential Apartment Zones.” 45 
“(a-2) It is unlawful to continue or resume targeting a residence in violation of this law 46 
after being instructed by a law enforcement officer to cease targeting a residence in violation of 47 
this law.”. 48 
Sec. 3. An Act To establish a code of law for the District of Columbia, approved March 49 
3, 1901 (31 Stat. 1189; D.C. Official Code passim), is amended to read as follows:  50 
(a) A new section (y) is added to read as follows:  51 
“ Sec. Y. Throwing Projectiles at Residential Property. 52 
“(a) It is unlawful for any person to launch or throw a projectile onto the residential 53 
property of another with the intent to cause fear, intimidate, retaliate against any,person living or 54 
working at that residence.” 55 
“(b) A person convicted of throwing projectiles at residential property shall be fined no 56 
more than the amount set forth in section 101 of the Criminal Fine Proportionality Amendment 57 
Act of 2012, effective June 11, 2013 (D.C. Law 19-317; D.C. Official Code § 22-3571.01), or 58   
3 
 
incarcerated for no more than 90 days.” 59 
Sec. 4. Section 11201a(b)(2) of the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government 60 
Improvement Act of 1997, approved August 7, 1997 (111 Stat. 734; D.C. Official Code § 24-61 
101.01(b)(2)) is amended by adding a new subparagraph (B-1) to read as follows: 62 
  “(B-1) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the term expiration 63 
date for a Council appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be December 7th of 64 
the year in which the term expires.”. 65 
Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 66 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 67 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 68 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 69 
 Sec. 6.  Effective date. 70 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 71 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 72 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 73 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 74 
Columbia Register. 75 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 76