District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1024 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/12/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT 
 
_____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Construction Codes 
Approval and Amendments Act of 1986 to require a property owner, contractor, or person 
applying for specific permits for construction work to demonstrate that his or her 
insurance will insure adjacent property owners for loss or damage that arises out of the 
proposed construction work. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Protecting Adjacent and Adjoining Property Owners from Construction 
Damage Second Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 6a(a)(2A) of the Co- nstruction Codes Approval and Amendments Act of 
1986, effective April 20, 1999 (D.C. Law 12-	261; D.C. Official Code § 6-1405.01(a)(2A)), is 
amended as follows:     
 (a) Subparagraph (B) is amended to read as follows: 
 “(B) The following permits shall require insurance pursuant to 
subparagraph (A) of this paragraph; provided, that the requirements shall only apply to permits 
issued 90 days after the adoption of emergency or final rules issued by the Mayor pursuant to 
subparagraph (E) of this paragraph:        
 “(i) An addition, alteration, and repair permit pursuant to which the 
applicant will be engaging in construction at the property line or on the party wall of an adjacent 
or adjoining property, or any construction activity for which a permit listed under sub-
subparagraph (iii), (iv), (v), (vi), (vii), or (viii) of this subparagraph would otherwise be required;       
 “(ii) An alteration and repair permit pursuant to which the 
applicant will be engaging in underpinning, construction at the property line or on the party wall 
of an adjacent or adjoining property, or any construction activity for which a permit listed under 
sub-subparagraph (iii), (iv), (v), (vi), (vii), or (viii) of this subparagraph would otherwise be 
required;       
 “(iii) A foundation permit;       
 “(iv) A demolition permit;        
 “(v) An excavation permit;        
 “(vi) A new building permit;       
 “(vii) A raze permit; and   
 “(viii) A sheeting and shoring permit.”.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 (b) Subparagraph (D)(i) is amended to read as follows:  
 “(i) “Adjacent property” means any privately held real property 
(all or a portion thereof) within 30 feet of a property line of the real property for which the 
permit is applied.”.  
 (c) Subparagraph (E) is amended to read as follows:  
 “(E) The Mayor shall issue rules to implement this paragraph, pursuant to 
the authority provided in section 10.”. 
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability date. 
 This act shall apply as of November 21, 2024.  
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a).   
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 
than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 
section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia