District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1029 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/12/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 
to clarify the definition of the term subscriber organization	; to amend the Lead -Hazard 
Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008 to clarify the definition of the term lead	-based 
paint; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 
to clarify the definition of the term producer. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 
of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 (	D.C. Law 13- 107; D.C. Official Code § 34	–1501(27A) ), is 
amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia 
law, or government entity, that owns” in its place.  
 
Sec. 3. Section 2 (20) of the Lead -Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008, 
effective March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17-	381; D.C. Official Code § 8–231.01(20	)), is amended by 
striking the phrase “	(0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 m g/cm²)” in its place.  
 
Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act 
of 2014, effective March 16, 2021 (	D.C. Law 23- 211; D.C. Official Code § 8–771.01(11)(A)	), is 
amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who 
manufactures a” in its place. 
 
Sec. 5. Applicability. 
(a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013. 
(b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. 
(c) Section 4 shall apply as of Mar	ch 16, 2021. 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 7. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia