ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 1 A BILL 1 2 25-1030 3 4 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 6 __________________ 7 8 9 To amend, on a temporary basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act to 10 clarify the definition of “subscriber organization,” to amend the Lead-Hazard Prevention 11 and Elimination Act of 2008 to clarify the definition of “lead-based paint,” and to amend 12 the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 to clarify the definition 13 of “producer.” 14 15 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 16 act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification 17 Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 18 Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 19 of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 ( D.C. Law 13- 107; D.C. Official Code § 34–1501(27A) ), is 20 amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia 21 law, or government entity, that owns” in its place. 22 Sec. 3. Section 2 (20) of the Lead -Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008, effective 23 March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17- 381; D.C. Official Code § 8–231.01(20), is amended by striking 24 the phrase “(0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 m g/cm²)” in its place. 25 Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act 26 of 2014, effective February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-154; D.C. Official Code § 8–771.01(11)(A)), 27 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 2 is amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who 28 manufactures a” in its place. 29 Sec. 5. Applicability. 30 (a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013. 31 (b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. 32 (c) Section 4 shall apply as of Mar ch 16, 2021. 33 Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 34 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 35 statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 36 October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 37 Sec. 7. Effective date. 38 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 39 the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30- day period of congressional review as 40 provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 41 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- 206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 42 Columbia Register. 43 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 44