District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1049 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/27/2024

                    1 
 
 1 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 2 
Councilmember Zachary Parker         Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 6 
Councilmember Anita Bonds                   Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 7 
 8 
 9 
 10 
 11 
A BILL 12 
 13 
_________ 14 
 15 
 16 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 17 
 18 
__________________ 19 
 20 
 21 
To amend, on an emergency basis, Title 28 of the District of Columbia Official Code	, to extend  22 
the applicability date of the cashless retailer prohibition to January 1, 2026.  23 
 24 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 25 
act may be cited as the “	Cashless Retailer Extension Emergency 	Amendment Act of 2024”	. 26 
Sec. 2. Section 28-5402 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by striking 27 
the phrase “Beginning January 1, 2025, a retailer	” and inserting the phrase “Beginning January 28 
1, 2026, a retailer” in its place. 29 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 30 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 31 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 32 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 33 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 34  2 
 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 35 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 36 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 37 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 38 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)).  39