District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1063 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/25/2024

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
November 25, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman, Council 
of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and enactment by the Council 
of the District of Columbia is an 
emergency bill, the "Contract No. 
CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC 
Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 
of 2024", and the accompanying 
emergency declaration resolution, in the not-to-exceed price 
of $15,848,608.48. The contract's 
period 
of performance is August 2, 2024, through August 	1, 2029. 
The legislation will approve multi year Contract No. 
CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing 
Company, LLC for structural firefighting personal protective equipment. In addition, the 
legislation will approve payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the 
contract. 
I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this contract. In order to 
facilitate a response to any questions, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, Chief Operating 
Officer, Office 
of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759. 
I urge you to take prompt and favorable action regarding the enclosed legislation.  2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
A BILL 
.?thairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
15 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. 	CWl 17729 with Globe 
16 Manufacturing Company, LLC and 	to authorize payment for the goods and services 
17 received and to be received under the contract. 
18 
19 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT 	OF COLUMBIA, That this 
20 act may be cited as the "Contract No. CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC 
21 Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 	of 2024." 
22 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
23 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 	803; D.C. Official Code§ 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the 
24 requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act 	of 2010, effective April 8, 
25 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.	C. Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves multiyear 
26 Contract No. CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC and authorizes payment 	in 
27 the not-to-exceed amount of $15,848,608.48 for the goods and services received and to be 
28 received under the contract. 
29 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
30 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 	of the Chief Financial Officer 	as the fiscal 
31 impact statement required by section 4a 	of the General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 197 5, 
32 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 	Code§ l-301.47a).   	2 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 1 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 2 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 3 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 4 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 5 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 6 
 7