District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill CER25-0076 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/06/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
1 
              
        
A CEREMONIAL RESOLUTION 
 
25-76 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 6, 2023 
 
 
To recognize and celebrate the inaugural Southwest Juneteenth Festival, to be held on Saturday, 
June 17, 2023 at the historic Carron Baptist Church in Southwest, DC. 
 
 WHEREAS, Juneteenth is a federal holiday in the United States and a holiday in the 
District of Columbia that commemorates the date of June 19, 1865, when those who were enslaved 
in the state of Texas learned that they had been freed, more than 2 years after President Abraham 
Lincoln signed the Emancipation Proclamation on January 1, 1863; 
 
 WHEREAS, the inaugural Southwest Juneteenth Festival will be held on Saturday, June 
17, 2023 at the historic Carron Baptist Church at 1354 First Street, SW, in the Southwest 
community; 
 
 WHEREAS, the festival will engage residents from across the District, along with t he 
James Creek, Syphax Gardens, Greenleaf Gardens, Greenleaf Gardens Additions, Greenleaf 
Gardens Extension, and Greenleaf Senior communities; 
 
 WHEREAS, the Southwest community has a storied history of Black leadership, 
scholarship, achievement, and historical prominence; 
 
 WHEREAS, the site of the festival – Carron Baptist Church – 	is celebrating 95 years of 
serving the District, and is led by the Rev. Peter J. Spann; 
 
 WHEREAS, the festival aligns with Carron 	Baptist Church’s mission and vision beyond 
its walls as a faith-based anchor for local and community-	wide residents; 
 
 WHEREAS, the festival will recognize the enslavement of Africans and African 
Americans and celebrate their freedom through reflective conversations about Juneteenth, music, 
dance, food, children’s activities, and a walking tour; and 
 
 WHEREAS, the festival will feature historian Louis C. Hicks, Jr. to lead festival goers in 
dialogue about Juneteenth . 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
2 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Southwest Juneteenth Festival Recognition Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia recognize	s and celebrates the inaugural 
Southwest Juneteenth Festival, to be held on Saturday, June 17, 2023 	at the historic Carron Baptist 
Church in Southwest, DC. 
 
Sec. 3. This resolution shall take effect immediately.