District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0054 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/11/2023

                     
 	1 
               ______________________________                                                                                1 
             Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr.  2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 
  9 
______ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to 17 
the need to allow consumers to request that credit reporting agencies include a 18 
statement with their credit reports to indicate they were financially impacted by 19 
the COVID-19 pandemic. 20 
 21 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 22 
this resolution may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Extension 23 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 
Sec. 2. (a) On October 4, 2022, the Council adopted the “Public Health 25 
Emergency Credit Alert Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2022”. The Act 26 
became law on October 31, 2022 and will expire on January 29, 2023. 27 
(b) On October 18, 2022, the Council adopted the “Public Health Emergency 28 
Credit Alert Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2022.” The temporary measure 29 
was signed by the Mayor on November 21, 2022.  30 
(c) The measure has not completed its 30-day Congressional review period. 31 
(d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law 32 
between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  33 
 34   
 	2 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the 35 
circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it 36 
necessary that the Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Extension Congressional 37 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 must be adopted after a single reading. 38 
 Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39