District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0057 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/13/2023

                    1 
________________________________ _____________________________ ______ 1 
Councilmember Charles Allen         Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 2 
  3 
  4 
  5 
  6 
  7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 
  9 
 _______ 10 
  11 
  12 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 
 14 
____________ 15 
   16 
 17 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to 18 
protect the rights of employees of District of Columbia Public Schools to serve on the State 19 
Board of Education which will soon become permanent law.  20 
 21 
RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 
resolution may be cited as the “State Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second 23 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 
Sec. 2. (a) On March 1, 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education 25 
Membership Eligibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective March 28, 2022 (D.C. 26 
Act 24-352; 69 DCR 2627) (“emergency act”). The emergency act ensured that District of 27 
Columbia Public Schools employees who wished to run for and serve on the State Board of 28 
Education were eligible to do so in the 2022 election cycle. 29 
 (b) On April 5, 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education Membership 30 
Eligibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on May 3, 2022 (D.C. Law 24-134-394; 31 
69 DCR 4411) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is set to expire on February 10, 2023. 32  2 
(c) On October 18, 2022 the Council passed the Elections Modernization Amendment 33 
Act of 2021, enacted November 21, 2022 (DC Act A24-642; 69 DCR 14609), which included a 34 
permanent version of the revisions to eligibility of the State Board of Education. This Act has yet 35 
to be approved by Congress.  36 
(c) Congressional review emergency legislation is now necessary to prevent a gap in the 37 
law between the expiration of the temporary act and the effective date of the permanent act. 38 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 39 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the State 40 
Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second Congressional Review Emergency 41 
Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.     42 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43