District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0057 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/17/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-12  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
January 17, 2023 
 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to permit employees of District of Columbia Public Schools to serve on the State Board of Education.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “State Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”	. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On March 1, 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education 
Membership Eligibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective March 28, 2022 (D	.C. 
Act 24-352; 69 DCR 2627) (“emergency act”). The emergency act ensure	d that District of 
Columbia Public Schools employees who wished to run for and serve on the State Board of 
Education were eligible to do so in the 2022 election cycle	. 
 (b) On April 5 , 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education Membership 
Eligibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, effective June 30, 2022 (	D.C. Law 24-134; 69 
DCR 4411) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is set to expire on February 10, 2023. 
(c) On October 18, 2022, the Council passed the Elections Modernization Amendment 
Act of 2021, enacted on 	November 21, 2022 (DC Act A24-	642; 69 DCR 14609) (“permanent 
act”), which included a permanent version of these revisions. The permanent act is pending 
congressional review.  
(c) Congressional review emergency legislation is now necessary to prevent a gap in the 
law between the expiration of the temporary act and the effective date of the permanent act. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the State Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second Congressional Review Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.     
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.