District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0083 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/02/2023

                     
 	1 
               ______________________________                                                                                1 
             Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr.  2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 
  9 
______ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to 17 
the need to amend the Department of General Services Establishment Act of 2011 18 
to exempt data that is security-sensitive from public dashboard disclosure 19 
requirements. 20 
 21 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 22 
this resolution may be cited as the “Protecting Security-Sensitive Dashboard Data 23 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 
Sec. 2. (a) On October 18, 2022, the Council adopted the “Protecting Security-25 
Sensitive Dashboard Data Emergency Amendment Act of 2022”. The Act became law on 26 
November 21, 2022 and will expire on February 19, 2023. 27 
(b) On November 1, 2022, the Council adopted the “Protecting Security-Sensitive 28 
Dashboard Data Temporary Amendment Act of 2022”. The temporary measure was 29 
signed by the Mayor on November 22, 2022 and is currently under Congressional review. 30 
(c) The measure will not complete the 30-day Congressional review period until 31 
March 8, 2023. 32 
(d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law 33 
between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  34   
 	2 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the 35 
circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it 36 
necessary that the Protecting Security-Sensitive Dashboard Data Congressional Review 37 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 must be adopted after a single reading. 38 
 Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39