District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0085 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-18  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 7, 2023 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to postpone the date by 
which students must be vaccinated against COVID-19.  
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”.  
Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the Coronavirus Immunization of 
School Students Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 22, 2022 (D.C. Act 
24-669; 69 DCR 14771), which is set to expire on February 20, 2023.  
(b) On November 15, 2022, the Council passed on second reading the Coronavirus 
Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 
2022 (D.C. Act 24-	678; 69 DCR 15080), which is expected to complete congressional review 
and become law on March 8, 2023.   
(c) Congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law 
between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 
Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional Review Emergency Amendment 
Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.