District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0089 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2023

                     
1 
                        ______________________________ 1 
        C	ouncilmember Charles Allen 2 
    3 
 4 
 5 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 
 7 
_______ 8 
 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
______________ 13 
 14 
 15 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 16 
to amend the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005 to 17 
provide that money in the Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge Assistance Fund may be 18 
provided to eligible residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 19 
Authority for payment of amounts due to the District of Columbia Water and Sewer 20 
Authority; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 21 
2014 to establish a December 31, 2022, deadline for the first submission of proposed 22 
stewardship plans to the Department of Energy and Environment, and to clarify that 23 
manufacturers must accept covered electronic equipment for recycling and reuse where a 24 
customer purchases the same type of electronic equipment from the manufacturer. 25 
 26 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That thi	s 27 
resolution may be cited as the “CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency 28 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 29 
 Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund 30 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 28, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-0675; 69 DCR 31 
014786) (“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on February 20, 2023. 32 
 (b) On November 15, 2022, the Council passed the CRIAC Assistance Fund Temporary 33 
Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-0695; 69 DCR 015129) 34 
(“temporary measure”). The temporary measure has been transmitted to Congress and has a 35 
projected law date of March 8, 2023. 36   
2 
 (c) This congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the 37 
law between the expiration of the emergency measure and the effective date of the temporary 38 
measure. 39 
 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 40 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the CRIAC 41 
Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a 42 
single reading.   43 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 44