District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0111 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2023

                    1 
_____________________________	_________________________ 1 
Councilmember Trayon White, S
r. 	Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 
3 
4 
5 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 
7 
8 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 11 
12 13 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 14 
to amend Chapter 35 of Title 47 of the District of Columbia Official Code to provide an 15 
additional property tax exemption for homeowners of the River East at Grandview 16 
Condominium. 17 18 
19 RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DI STRICT OF COLUM BIA, That this 
20 resolution may be cited as the “River East at Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption 
21 Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
Sec. 2. (a) On October 18, 2022, the Council unanimously approved the “River East at 22 
Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Emergency Amendment Act of 2022.” The 23 
Emergency Act became law on November 3, 2022, and expired on February 1, 2023.   24 
(b) On November 1, 2022, the Council unanimously approved the “River East at 25 
Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Temporary Amendment Act of 2022.” The 26 
Temporary Act is in the has been transmitted to Congress, and the projected law date is March 8, 27 
2023. 28 
(c) In order to address the gap in the law between the e	xpiration of the Emergency Act 29 
and the effective date of the Temporary Act, it is necessary to approve congressional review 30 
emergency legislation. 31   
2 
 
 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 32 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the River 33 
East at Grandview Estates Condominium Assistance Property Tax Exemption Congressional 34 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022 be adopted after a single reading. 35 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  36