District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0111 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-22  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 7, 2023 
 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend section 47- 3503 of the District of Columbia Official Code to provide for an 
extended real property tax exemption for unit owners of the River East at Grandview 
Condominiums for the duration of their relocation from the property. 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “River East at Grandview Condominiums Property Tax 
Exemption Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. (a) On October 18, 2022, the Council passed the River East at Grandview 
Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective 
November 3, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	636; 69 DCR 14181) (“Emergency Act”). The Emergency Act 
became law on November 3, 2022, and expired on February 1, 2023.   
 (b) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the River East at Grandview 
Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on 
November 22, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	665; 69 DCR 14760) (“Temporary Act”). The Temporary Act 
has been transmitted to Congress, and it is projected to become law on March 8, 2023. 
 (c) To address the gap in the law between the expiration of the Emergency Act and the 
effective date of the Temporary Act, congressional review emergency legislation is necessary. 
 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the River East at Grandview Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Congressional Review Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023 	be adopted after a single reading. 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.