District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0161 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/04/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-104  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
April 4, 2023 
 
 
To approve, on an emergency basis, a Contract for Services, Contract No. DCHA CA-XI-2023, 
with Chiaramonte Construction Company to fund on-call construction, repair, and 
replacement services for the District of Columbia Housing Authority’s portfolio of 
projects.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Contract for Services with Chiaramonte Construction Company 
Contract No. DCHA CA-XI-2023 Emergency Approval Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2.  Pursuant to section 451(c) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Office Code § 1-204.51(c)), and section 202 of the 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. DCHA CA-XI-2023, a multiyear 
agreement between the District of Columbia Housing Authority (“DCHA”) and Chiaramonte 
Construction Company to provide on-call construction, repair, and replacement services for 
DCHA’s portfolio of projects. 
 
 Sec. 3. Transmittal. 
The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 
Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.  
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  
This resolution shall take effect immediately.