District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0177 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/17/2023

                    a 
~ 
March 17, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 
Washington, 
DC 20004-3003 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
District of Columbia Housing Authority 
1133 North Capitol Street N.E., 
Washington, DC 20002-7599 
(202] 535-1000 I dchousing.org 
Brenda Donald, Executive Director 
Pursuant to D.C. Official Code 	§ 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration 	by the Council of 
the District of Columbia, the Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long 
Term Subsidy Contract ("ALTSC") between the District 
of Columbia Housing Authority 
("DCHA") and Fort Totten Limited Partnership (the "Owner"). DCHA proposes to provide a 
housing subsidy to the Owner in the initial annual amount 
of Seven Hundred Twenty Three 
Thousand Eight Hundred Eighty Eight Dollars ($723,888) annually for a multi-year term 
of 
fifteen (15) years, in support 	of the District's Local Rent Supplement Program ("LRSP") to 
provide affordable housing units at Fort Totten Senior Apartments located at 5543 South Dakota 
Avenue, NE. 
Concurrently, 
I have also enclosed for consideration 	by the Council the Local Rent Supplement 
Program Contract No. 
2021-LRSP-0lA Approval Resolution of 2023. 
As always, 
I am available to discuss any questions you 	may have regarding the proposed LTSC. 
In order to facilitate a response to any questions concerning this 	AL TSC, please have your staff 
contact 
me at (202) 535-1513. 
I look forward to your favorable consideration 
of this proposed AL TSC agreement. 
Sincerely, 
Brenda Donald 
Executive Director, District 
of Columbia Housing Authority 
Enclosures 
BD/hg 
OCHA is committed to providing equal access to this event f or aU participants 6 residents with disabilities. If you need a reasonable accommodation or sign language 
i
nterpreter service, please contact our ADA/504/Language Department at 202-535-2737 or AOA504@dchousing.org with your complete request. Please allow at least 3 
business days to make the necessary arrangements. If you need a foreign language translator. please contact our ADA/504/Language Department at 202-535-2737 or email 
LA@dchousing.org. Please alow at least 5 business days to make the necessary arrangements.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
33 
34 
35 
36 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
~~,c..--. 
~hil Mendelson 
at the request 
of District of 
Columbia Housing Authority 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 	15 years in support of the 
District's Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with 
affordable housing units for Contract No. 2021-LRSP-0 
IA with Fort Totten Limited 
Partnership for LRSP units at Fort Totten located at 5543 South Dakota, NE, 
Washington, D.C. 20011. 
RESOLVED, 
BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the "Local Rent Supplement Program with Fort Totten Senior 
Apartments Contract No. 2021-LRSP-0 
IA Approval Resolution of 2023 ". 
Sec. 
2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II 	of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support 
Act 
of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income 
households in the District. The passage 
of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program 
("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to 
extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless or in need 
of 
supportive services, such as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based, 
tenant-based, and sponsored-based LRSP affordable housing units. The BSA provided for the  3 7 District of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf 	of the 
3 8 District. 
39 (b) In 2021, the DCHA participated in a request for proposals issued by the District 
of 
40 Columbia Department of Housing and Community Development. 	Of the multiple proposals 
41 received, ten (10) developers were chosen to work with DCHA and other District agencies 	to 
42 develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units for extremely low-income 
43 families making zero to 30% 	of the area's median income, 	as well as the chronically homeless 
44 and individuals with mental or physical disabilities. Upon approval 
of the contract by the 
45 Council, DCHA will enter into an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract 
46 ("ALTSC") with the selected housing providers under the LRSP for housing services. 
47 (c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long term subsidy contract with Fort 
48 Totten Limited Partnership under the LRSP in order to provide long-term affordable housing 
49 units for extremely low-income households for units located at 5543 South Dakota, N.E. 
50 ( d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an ALTSC between the District 
51 of Columbia Housing Authority and Fort Totten Limited Partnership with respect to the payment 
52 
of a rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Fort Totten and house 
53 extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less 	of the area median income. 
54 Sec. 
3. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
55 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official 	Code§ 1-204.51), and section 202 	of the 
56 Procurement Practices Reform Act 
of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
57 Official 
Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Fort Totten Limited 
58 Partnership to provide an operating subsidy in support 
of thirty-nine (39) affordable units in 
59 an initial amount 
not to exceed $723,888.00 annually. 
2  60 
61 Sec. 4. Transmittal. 
62 The Council shall transmit a copy 
of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District 	of 
63 Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor. 
64 
65 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
66 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 	of the Chief Financial Officer as the 
67 fiscal impact statement required by section 4a 	of the General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 197 5, 
68 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 	Code§ l-301.47a). 
69 
70 Sec. 6. Effective date. 
71 This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
3