District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0214 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/26/2023

                    April 26, 2023
Dear Chairman Mendelson:
1310SOUTHERN AVENUE. SE WASHINGTON. D.C. 20032-4623 • 202-574-6000 WWW.UNITED-MEDICALCENTER.COM
The Honorable Phil Mendelson
Chairman, Council of the District of Columbia
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite 504
Washington, DC 20004
Council action is necessary to approve the December 7,2022, fully exercised Option Year 
3 Modification 7 (in the amount of $800,000.00 and a period of October 31, 2022 to 
October 30,2023) and Proposed Modification 8 (in the amount of $800,000.00 and a period 
of October 31, 2022 to October 30, 2023) because when combined, the total retroactive 
contract value of Option Year 3 would be $1,600,000.00 for the 12-month period, October 
31, 2022 to October 30, 2023. Continued approval is vital to avoiding a major disruption 
in these services. The unfortunate retroactivity, which as discussed during recent oversight 
hearings, is due to constantly increasing nurse agency costs, extended time needed to 
negotiate financial terms, nationwide industry shortages, and the pending wind down.
As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this submittal. 
In order to facilitate a response to any questions you may have, please have your staff 
contact me at (202) 574-6611.1 look forward to a favorable consideration on this contract.
Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is 
Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit 
Hospital Corporation and Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc., Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2023, and Contract No. NFPHCNUR-1 9-C-003 
Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and 
Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of2023, for the provision for specialty and non-specialty temporary 
assignment nurses.
Sincerely,
Jacqueline Payne-Borden
Chief Executive Officer
Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation 
Enclosures
UNITED 
' MXDiCAl CIKTU   A
 RESOLUTION
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That
this resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 728
and 8 between the Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation and Contemporary Nursing29
Solutions Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution30
of 2023”.31
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No.32
NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 (“Contract”) between the Not-for-Profit33
Hospital Corporation (“Hospital”) and Contemporary Nursing Solutions, Inc. for the34
provision for specialty and non-specialty temporary assignment nurses, and to authorize35
payment for the services received and to be received under this Contract.36
1
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
.22
23
24
25
26
27
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request of the Not-for- 
Profit Hospital Corporation
1
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract 
No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit 
Hospital Corporation, commonly known as United Medical Center (“Hospital”), 
and Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc., for the provision for specialty and non­
specialty temporary assignment nurses, and to authorize payment for the services 
received and to be received under the Contract.   (b) UMC determined that exercising Option Year 3 of the Contract was necessary37
i'
due to the ongoing need for specialty and non-specialty temporary assignment nurses.38
The Option Year 3 Modification #7 had a value of $800,000.00 for the period of October39
31, 2022 through October 30, 2023, and was fully executed on December 7, 2022.40
(c) Proposed Modification #8 for an additional $800,000.00 and a period of41
42
43
the period of October 31, 2022 - October 30, 2023, and would have an aggregate value44
45
(d) Without this approval, Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc. cannot be paid46
for these critical services provided and to be provided in excess of $999,999.99.47
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 248
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that Contract No. NFPHCNUR-49
50
51
52
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.53
2
that exceeds $1 million in a 12-month period; therefore, Council approval is necessary.
i
October 30, 2022 through October 30, 2023, is necessary to allow continued use of this
Contract. If approved, the combined value of Option Year 3 would be $1,600,000.00 for
19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and
\
Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency
Act of 2023, be adopted after a single reading.